Nodibinājums Svētā Franciska Mākslas Skola
Foundation
Informational products
Full company profile
Officers, members, turnover, profit, pledges, security measures, true beneficiaries, contacts, and other actual and historical information. Includes AML and sanctions check also.
Basic data
Status | Active
|
---|---|
Business form | Foundation |
Registered name | "Nodibinājums Svētā Franciska Mākslas Skola" |
Registration number, date | 40008069149, 05.08.2002 |
VAT number | None Europe VAT register |
Register, date | Register of Associations and Foundations, 11.02.2005 |
Legal address | Elizabetes iela 20, Rīga, LV-1050 Check address owners |
CSDD | Transport vehicles registered in CSDD |
Important facts
- No active pledges
- No security means
- No economic activity cessation
- Has activity restrictions
- Show AML risks
- Nav ieraksti maksātnespējas reģistrā
- No liquidations
- No reorganizations
- No contacts information
- Check online actual tax payments in SRS
- Request debt return with VERDIKTS
Actual overdue payments
Request debt return with VERDIKTS
Date | Case number | Status |
---|---|---|
None |
Taxes payments to government budget
2021 | |
---|---|
Total payments to state budget (thousands, €) | 0 |
Personal income tax (thousands, €) | 0 |
Statutory social insurance contributions (thousands, €) | 0 |
Average employees count | 2 |
Source: SRS
Check online actual tax payments in SRS
Industries
Field from SRS | Papīra un kartona ražošana (17.12) |
---|---|
Goals | Respektējot kultūras vērtību relativitāti mūsdienās, ar tēlotājas mākslas izteiksmes līdzekļiem un vizuālās komunikācijas metodēm, popularizēt sabiedrībā: humānisma (skaistums kā skaidrība un harmonija) ideālus, kristīgās vērtības, politisko, sociālo un reliģisko toleranci, solidārās savstarpējās attiecības, videi draudzīgu dzīves stilu, ekoloģisko attieksmi pret publisko telpu, Asīzes Franciska (13.gs. Itālija) devīzi: "Dabiskums, vienkāršība un cilvēcība". |
True beneficiaries
True beneficiary | Time | Place of permanent residence | Nationality |
---|---|---|---|
Natural person | From 27.07.2019 | Latvia | Latvia |
Control type: as a representative of the executive institution or of the administrative body |
|||
Natural person | From 27.07.2019 | Latvia | Latvia |
Control type: as a representative of the executive institution or of the administrative body |
|||
Natural person | From 27.07.2019 | Latvia | Latvia |
Control type: as a representative of the executive institution or of the administrative body |
Officials
Name | Institution | Position | Representation/signatory powers | Notes | From* |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natural person |
Executive Board | Jointly with at least 1 | 03.07.2009 | ||
Natural person |
Executive Board | Jointly with at least 1 | 03.07.2009 | ||
Natural person |
Executive Board | Right to represent individually | 03.07.2009 |
* Date on which the decision of the notary public on the appointment took effect
Historical company names
Svētā Franciska mākslas skola | Until 11.02.2005 | 19 years ago |
---|
Historical addresses
Rīga, Kalēju iela 8 | Until 25.06.2009 | 15 years ago |
---|
Annual reports
Year | Period | Received | Type of delivery | Price | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
2007 |
Annual report | 30.05.2008 | TIF (351.1 KB) | ||
2006 |
Annual report | 26.04.2007 | TIF (179.4 KB) |